U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00574-CEF-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.