U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00559-CAB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Deadlines]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 29, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 29, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.