U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revoke]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Suppress ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 21, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • October 19, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 29, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 29, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.