U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00557-SO-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Block
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 30, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.