U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00857-BYP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Younger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.