U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00441-JG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adeleke, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.