U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00567-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cornell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Information - Felony]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.