U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00522-BYP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.