U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00241-BYP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.