U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00398-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.