U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wampler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • October 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.