U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00591-JPC-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Beshara et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 20, 2023: [Seal ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.