U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00561-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Suppress ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.