U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00565-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Branca, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.