U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00562-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.