U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00482-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Vacate (2255) ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 11, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 07, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.