U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rayford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 17, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.