U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00051-SO-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grisby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 11, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.