U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00554-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of Recusal/Reassignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.