U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00521-JG-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Congress et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • November 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Entry]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 11, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.