U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00588-JRK-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Osley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • October 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.