U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dukes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Revoke]
  • January 11, 2023: [Information - Felony]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • October 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.