U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Revoke]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.