U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00606-CEF-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Stubbs, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.