U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00604-BMB-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.