U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00598-SL-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.