U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00117-2
  • Case Name: USA v. May et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 19, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Detention]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.