U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • October 18, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.