U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jakits
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 06, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 25, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • January 05, 2023: [Omnibus Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Revoke]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Supplemental - Supporting (non motion)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appear - Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.