U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McMahan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.