U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00599-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arrendondo, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Designate Case Complex]
  • November 15, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appoint Expert ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.