U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00553-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Muhammad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.