U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00523-PAG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crayton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.