U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mosca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
  • December 01, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Correction to Add Original Counts]
  • October 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.