U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Satterfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 25, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bond]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.