U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00556-BYP-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Nemeth, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.