U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00563-JRA-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.