U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00594-DAR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wheat
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.