U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Status Conference ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 07, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.