U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Combs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Writ ]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 09, 2022: [Writ ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.