U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00634-SL-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bradley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Compassionate Release re First Step Act of 2018 ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - 821 Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.