U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00613-PAG-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Schoenfeld
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Designate Case Complex]
  • December 20, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order of Recusal/Reassignment]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.