U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woleslagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Related Case Memorandum]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.