U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00463-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Worthy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.