U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeremy C. Mooney, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Order]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.