U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00579-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 02, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.