U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.