U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00577-BYP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.