U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Reassignement/Recusal]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 12, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.