U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cantrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • November 30, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • November 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Revoke]
  • November 14, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.